Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 11/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/29/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/21/2010