Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/28/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/15/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/01/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/01/2010