Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/13/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/13/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/13/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/13/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2010