There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title X of the Public Health Service Act to prohibit family planning grants from being awarded to any entity that performs abortions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
01/22/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/22/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H446-447)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/11/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/22/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/22/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/21/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/22/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.614.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.614. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2009)

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to prohibit the Secretary of Health and Human Service from providing any federal family planning assistance to an entity unless the entity certifies that, during the period of such assistance, the entity will not perform, and will not provide any funds to any other entity that performs, an abortion. Excludes an abortion where: (1) the pregnancy is the result of an act of rape or an act of incest against a minor; or (2) a physician certifies that the woman suffered from a physical disorder, injury, or illness that would place the woman in danger of death unless an abortion is performed, including a condition caused by or arising from the pregnancy. Excludes hospitals from such requirement so long as the hospital does not provide funds to any non-hospital entity that performs an abortion.

Requires the Secretary to annually provide Congress: (1) information on grantees who performed abortions under the exceptions; and (2) a list of entities to which grant funds are made available.