Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/11/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/22/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/22/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2010