Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/21/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/04/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/26/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/02/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/08/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/27/2010