Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/18/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-315.
12/18/2010 Signed by President.
12/09/2010 Presented to President.
12/07/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8605)
12/01/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7823-7824)
09/22/2010 Introduced in House