Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/13/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-280.
10/13/2010 Signed by President.
10/01/2010 Presented to President.
09/29/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7763)
09/28/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7063-7064)
09/23/2010 Introduced in House