Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/02/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/03/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/11/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/06/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/21/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/11/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/03/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/20/2010