Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/26/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/28/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/02/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/09/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/10/2010