Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/16/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/21/2010