Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/03/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/12/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/25/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/26/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/02/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/30/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/01/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/23/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/27/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/27/2009