There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a pilot program in certain United States district courts to encourage enhancement of expertise in patent cases among district judges.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-349. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/17/2010Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 371 - 1 (Roll no. 651).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/16/2010 H8536-8537)
12/13/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2010Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 7 (Roll no. 130).(text: CR H3456-3457)
01/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-349. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010HousePresented to President.
12/17/2010-1:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/17/2010-1:48pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 371 - 1 (Roll no. 651). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/16/2010 H8536-8537)
12/17/2010-1:36pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8762-8763)
12/16/2010-1:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Chu objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/16/2010-12:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 628.
12/16/2010-12:57pmHouseMs. Chu moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8536-8539)
12/14/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2010SenateS.Amdt.4801 Amendment SA 4801 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/13/2010SenateS.Amdt.4801 Amendment SA 4801 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Leahy. (consideration: CR S8946-8947; text: CR S8946-8947) In the nature of a substitute.
12/13/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8946-8947)
12/13/2010SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/18/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/17/2009-3:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/17/2009-3:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 409 - 7 (Roll no. 130). (text: CR H3456-3457)
03/17/2009-3:15pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3471)
03/17/2009-1:34pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Issa objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
03/17/2009-1:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 628.
03/17/2009-1:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3456-3459)
03/17/2009-1:20pmHouseMr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/22/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/22/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/10/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/22/2009 Referred to
Senate Judiciary03/18/2009 Referred to
12/13/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.628. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-349 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 13, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Establishes a pilot program in certain U.S. district courts under which: (1) those district judges who request to hear cases involving patent or plant variety protection issues are designated by the chief judge to hear them; (2) such cases are randomly assigned to the district court judges, regardless of whether they are designated; (3) a judge not designated to whom such a case is assigned may decline to accept the case; and (4) a case so declined is randomly reassigned to one of those judges so designated.