Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/12/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/12/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2009