Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/30/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/08/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/09/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/14/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/21/2010