Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/10/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/29/2010