There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 337 West Clark Street in Eureka, California, as the "Sam Sacco Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2010Became Public Law No: 111-305. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2010Signed by President.
12/03/2010Presented to President.
12/02/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8443)
12/01/2010Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
11/16/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7470)
09/29/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2010Became Public Law No: 111-305. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2010Signed by President.
12/03/2010HousePresented to President.
12/03/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/02/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8443)
12/01/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
12/01/2010SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
11/30/2010SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/17/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/16/2010-3:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2010-3:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7470)
11/16/2010-3:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6387.
11/16/2010-3:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7470-7471)
11/16/2010-3:39pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/29/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/29/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 09/29/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/29/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/29/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/29/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/29/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform09/29/2010 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/17/2010 Referred to
11/30/2010 Markup by
12/01/2010 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.6387.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6387. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-305 (12/14/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 337 West Clark Street in Eureka, California, as the "Sam Sacco Post Office Building."