Text: H.R.6411 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (12/01/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6411


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

December 1, 2010

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations


AN ACT

To provide for the approval of the Agreement Between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of Australia Concerning Peaceful Uses of Nuclear Energy.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Approval of Agreement Between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of Australia Concerning Peaceful Uses of Nuclear Energy.

(a) In general.—Notwithstanding the provisions for congressional consideration of a proposed agreement for cooperation in subsection d. of section 123 of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 (42 U.S.C. 2153), the Agreement Between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of Australia Concerning Peaceful Uses of Nuclear Energy, done at New York, May 4, 2010, may become effective on or after October 8, 2010, as if all the requirements in such section 123 for consideration of such agreement had been satisfied, subject to subsection (b) of this section.

(b) Applicability of Atomic Energy Act of 1954 and other provisions of law.—Upon coming into effect, the agreement referred to in subsection (a) shall be subject to the provisions of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 (42 U.S.C. 2011 et seq.) and any other applicable United States law as if such agreement had come into effect in accordance with the requirements of section 123 of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954.

Passed the House of Representatives November 30, 2010.

    Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
    Clerk

Share This Section