There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to provide for the further extension of emergency unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/18/2010Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
11/17/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/18/2010-2:00pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2010-1:52pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7575-7576)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2010-1:23pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2010-12:46pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6419.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2010-12:46pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7569-7575; text of measure as introduced: CR H7569-7570)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2010-12:46pmMr. Levin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/17/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/18/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/18/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/18/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/18/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/18/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/17/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6419. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/2010)

Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act - Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 with respect to the state-established individual emergency unemployment compensation account (EUCA). Extends the final date for entering a federal-state agreement under the Emergency Unemployment Compensation (EUC) program through February 28, 2011. Postpones the termination of the program until July 31, 2011.

Amends the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act to extend until March 1, 2011, requirements that federal payments to states cover 100% of EUC.

Amends the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 to exempt weeks of unemployment between enactment of this Act and July 31, 2011, from the prohibition in the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 against federal matching payments to a state for the first week in an individual's eligibility period for which extended compensation or sharable regular compensation is paid if the state law provides for payment of regular compensation to an individual for his or her first week of otherwise compensable unemployment. (Thus allows temporary federal matching for the first week of extended benefits for states with no waiting period.)

Amends the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 to authorize a state by law to apply certain requirements of the Act, with specified substitutions, for determining an extended unemployment compensation period. Requires the state's "on" and "off" indicators to be based on its rate of insured unemployment and rate of total unemployment for the period between enactment of this Act (or, if later, the date established pursuant to state law), and ending on or before March 1, 2011.