Text: H.R.6419 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6419


To amend the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to provide for the further extension of emergency unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

November 17, 2010

Mr. McDermott (for himself, Mr. Levin, Mr. Kildee, Mr. Dingell, Ms. Matsui, Mr. Gutierrez, Ms. Berkley, Ms. Pingree of Maine, Ms. Norton, Mr. Stark, Mr. Grijalva, Ms. Hirono, Mr. Conyers, Ms. Lee of California, Mr. Blumenauer, Mr. Nadler of New York, Ms. DeLauro, Mr. Ellison, Mr. Langevin, and Mr. Olver) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to provide for the further extension of emergency unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act”.

SEC. 2. Extension of unemployment insurance provisions.

(a) In general.—(1) Section 4007 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(A) by striking “November 30, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “February 28, 2011”;

(B) in the heading for paragraph (2) of subsection (b), by striking “November 30, 2010” and inserting “February 28, 2011”; and

(C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking “April 30, 2011” and inserting “July 31, 2011”.

(2) Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note), is amended—

(A) by striking “December 1, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “March 1, 2011”; and

(B) in subsection (c), by striking “May 1, 2011” and inserting “August 1, 2011”.

(3) Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “April 30, 2011” and inserting “July 31, 2011”.

(b) Funding.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (E), by striking “and” at the end; and

(2) by inserting after subparagraph (F) the following:

“(G) the amendments made by section 2(a)(1) of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act; and”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–205; 124 Stat. 2236).

SEC. 3. Temporary modification of indicators.

(a) Indicators based on rate of insured unemployment.—Section 203(d) of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by inserting before the last sentence the following: “Effective with respect to compensation for weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act (or, if later, the date established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before March 1, 2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether there has been a State ‘on’ or ‘off’ indicator beginning or ending any extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if paragraph (1)(A) had been amended by striking ‘the preceding two calendar years’ and inserting ‘the preceding three calendar years’; except that, notwithstanding any such provision of State law, any week for which there would otherwise be a State ‘on’ indicator shall continue to be such a week and shall not be determined to be a week for which there is a State ‘off’ indicator.”.

(b) Indicators based on rate of total unemployment.—Section 203(f) of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) by redesignating paragraph (2) as paragraph (3); and

(2) by inserting after paragraph (1) the following:

“(2) Effective with respect to compensation for weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act (or, if later, the date established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before March 1, 2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether there has been a State ‘on’ or ‘off’ indicator beginning or ending any extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if paragraph (1)(A)(ii) had been amended—

“(A) by striking ‘either (or both)’ and inserting ‘either (or all)’; and

“(B) by striking ‘the preceding 2 calendar years’ and inserting ‘the preceding 3 calendar years’.

Notwithstanding any provision of a State law described in this paragraph, any week for which there would otherwise be a State ‘on’ indicator shall continue to be such a week and shall not be determined to be a week for which there is a State ‘off’ indicator.”.