There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grand Canyon Watersheds Protection Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To withdraw the Tusayan Ranger District and Federal land managed by the Bureau of Land Management in the vicinity of Kanab Creek and in House Rock Valley from location, entry, and patent under the mining laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/21/2009Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
02/04/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/04/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/22/2009Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/22/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands02/04/2009 Referred to
07/21/2009 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/04/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.644.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.644. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2009)

Grand Canyon Watersheds Protection Act of 2009 - Withdraws the approximately 1,068,908 acres of the Tusayan Ranger District and federal land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) in the vicinity of Kanab Creek and in House Rock Valley from: (1) all forms of entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) operation of the mineral leasing, geothermal leasing, and mineral materials laws. Subjects such withdrawal to valid, existing rights.