Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2010