There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Emergency Centers Establishment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish national emergency centers on military installations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/06/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Unconventional Threats and Capabilities.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/23/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/22/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2009Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2009Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E122-123)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/29/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/22/2009 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management01/23/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services01/22/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Terrorism, Unconventional Threats and Capabilities02/06/2009 Referred to
House Homeland Security09/22/2010 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2009)

National Emergency Centers Establishment Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish at least six national emergency centers on military installations to use existing infrastructure to provide: (1) temporary housing, medical, and humanitarian assistance to individuals and families dislocated due to an emergency or major disaster; and (2) centralized locations for the training of first responders and the coordination of preparedness, response, and recovery efforts.

Lists minimum requirements for sites for such centers, including that they be capable of: (1) meeting for an extended period the housing, health, transportation, education, public works, humanitarian, and other transition needs of a large number of individuals affected; (2) being scaled up or down to accommodate major disaster preparedness and response drills, operations, and procedures; (3) housing existing permanent structures necessary to meet training and first responders coordination requirements during non-disaster periods; and (4) hosting the infrastructure necessary to rapidly adjust to temporary housing, medical, and humanitarian assistance needs.

Sets forth center location requirements, including requiring the Secretary to designate closed military installations as sites whenever possible and to designate portions of existing military installations as centers otherwise.