Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/17/2009