Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/28/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/28/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/28/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/28/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 08/10/2010