There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2010 to improve the Littoral Combat Ship program of the Navy.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8359)
12/02/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
12/22/2010SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
12/16/2010SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/15/2010-10:51amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/15/2010-10:51amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8359)
12/15/2010-10:31amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6494.
12/15/2010-10:31amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8359-8362)
12/15/2010-10:31amHouseMr. Taylor moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/14/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Expeditionary Forces.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
12/02/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
12/02/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services12/02/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Expeditionary Forces12/14/2010 Referred to
Senate Armed Services12/22/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6494.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6494. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/15/2010)

Amends provisions of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2010 relating to the Navy's littoral combat ship program to: (1) increase from 10 to 20 the number of such ships authorized to be procured, including any ship control and weapons systems that the Secretary of the Navy determines necessary for such ships; (2) allow one or more contracts to be entered into for such procurement; and (3) require the government to be permitted to conduct a competition for an additional shipyard for ship construction, to build a design specification for that ship.