Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-370.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/18/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2010 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10695-10696)
12/14/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 363 - 0 (Roll no. 630).(text: CR H8326)
12/09/2010 Introduced in House