There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make technical corrections to provisions of law enacted by the Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2010.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-330. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/17/2010Presented to President.
12/15/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10308; text: CR 12/14/2010 H8328-8329))
12/14/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8328-8329)
12/13/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/22/2010Became Public Law No: 111-330. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2010Signed by President.
12/17/2010HousePresented to President.
12/16/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10308; text: CR 12/14/2010 H8328-8329))
12/14/2010SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/14/2010-5:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/14/2010-5:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8328-8329)
12/14/2010-4:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6516.
12/14/2010-4:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8328-8329)
12/14/2010-4:58pmHouseMr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
12/13/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/13/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6516.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6516. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-330 (12/22/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Makes technical and conforming changes to the Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2010.