There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Omnibus Trade Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Omnibus Trade Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Omnibus Trade Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend trade adjustment assistance and certain trade preference programs, to amend the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to modify temporarily certain rates of duty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/29/2010Became Public Law No: 111-344. (TXT | PDF)
12/29/2010Signed by President.
12/23/2010Presented to President.
12/22/2010Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8982-8983)
12/22/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8418-8448)
12/13/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/29/2010Became Public Law No: 111-344. (TXT | PDF)
12/29/2010Signed by President.
12/23/2010HousePresented to President.
12/22/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2010-5:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/22/2010-5:58pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8982-8983)
12/22/2010-5:58pmHouseMr. McDermott asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8982-8983)
12/22/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2010SenateS.Amdt.4924 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2010SenateS.Amdt.4924 Amendment SA 4924 proposed by Senator Brown OH. (consideration: CR S11011) In the nature of a substitute.
12/22/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11011)
12/16/2010SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/15/2010-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/15/2010-6:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8418-8448)
12/15/2010-5:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6517.
12/15/2010-5:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8418-8452)
12/15/2010-5:50pmHouseMr. Levin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/13/2010HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
12/13/2010HouseReferred to House Education and Labor
12/13/2010HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
12/13/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/13/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/13/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor12/13/2010 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce12/13/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6517. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-344 (12/29/2010)

Omnibus Trade Act of 2010 - Title I: Extension of Trade Adjustment Assistance and Health Coverage Improvement - Subtitle A: Extension of Trade Adjustment Assistance - (Sec. 101) Amends the Trade and Globalization Adjustment Assistance Act of 2009 to extend trade adjustment assistance (TAA) programs through February 12, 2011.

Requires funding levels for TAA programs under prior law to apply beginning February 13, 2011, as if the amendments made by this Act had never been enacted. Amends the Trade Act of 1974, however, to authorize appropriations through February 12, 2012 for: (1) TAA programs for workers, firms, and farmers; and (2) alternative TAA for older workers.

Limits for FY2010, and the six-week period January 1, 2011-February 12, 2011, the total amount of payments that may be made by the Secretary of Labor for training assistance for workers.

Authorizes appropriations for the reemployment TAA program through February 12, 2011.

Authorizes the Secretary for FY2010, and the six-week period January 1, 2011- February 12, 2011, to make certain TAA funds available for grants to assist eligible communities to develop strategic plans for their economic adjustment to the impact of trade .

Extends permanently certain reporting requirements under: (1) the Community College and Career Training Grant program, and (2) the Industry or Sector Partnership Grant program for communities impacted by trade.

Authorizes appropriations to the Secretary for FY2010, and the six-week period January 1, 2011-February 12, 2011, to carry out the Sector Partnership Grant program.

(Sec. 102) Extends the single transition deadline for implementing certain merit-based personnel staffing requirements for state administration of TAA to a date not earlier than February 12, 2011.

Subtitle B: Health Coverage Improvement - (Sec. 111) Amends the Internal Revenue Code (IRC) to extend through February 12, 2011, the 80% tax credit for health insurance costs (including advance payments) for TAA (as well as Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation [PBGC] pension) recipients.

(Sec. 113) Makes TAA recipients who are in a break in training under a training program, or who are receiving unemployment compensation, eligible for such tax credit for the period through February 12, 2011.

(Sec. 114) Amends the IRC, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Public Health Service Act (PHSA) to extend through February 12, 2011, the TAA pre-certification period rule disregarding any 63-day lapse in creditable health care coverage for TAA workers.

(Sec. 115) Extends the continued eligibility for the credit for qualifying family members and certain qualified TAA-eligible individuals and PBGC pension recipients for COBRA premium assistance through February 12, 2011.

(Sec. 117) Extends through February 12, 2011, coverage under an employee benefit plan funded by a voluntary employees' beneficiary association established pursuant to an order of a bankruptcy court, or by agreement with an authorized representative.

Title II: Andean Trade Preferences Act - (Sec. 201) Amends the Andean Trade Preference Act (ATPA), as amended and expanded by Andean Trade Promotion and Drug Eradication Act (ATPDEA), to extend duty-free treatment or other preferential treatment of the products of Colombia and Ecuador through February 12, 2011.

Extends through FY2012 preferential treatment for apparel articles assembled in one or more ATPDEA beneficiary countries from regional fabrics or regional components, and specified other type apparel (brassieres).

Title III: Offsets - (Sec. 301) Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (COBRA) to extend certain customs users fees for the processing of merchandise entered into the United States through January 7, 2020, and other specified customs users fees through January 14, 2020.

(Sec. 302) Amends the Hiring Incentives to Restore Employment Act to increase required estimated tax payments of corporations with at least $1 billion in assets in the third quarter of 2015 by 4.5% to 126.0% of such amount.

Title IV: Budgetary Effects - (Sec. 401) Declares that the budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, provided that such statement has been submitted before the vote on passage.