Text: H.R.6556 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/17/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6556

To provide for the further temporary extension of the emergency unemployment compensation program, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
December 17, 2010

Ms. Lee of California (for herself and Mr. Scott of Virginia) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To provide for the further temporary extension of the emergency unemployment compensation program, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Emergency Unemployment Compensation Expansion Act”.

SEC. 2. Temporary extension of unemployment insurance provisions.

(a) In general.—(1) Section 4007 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(A) by striking “November 30, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “January 3, 2012”;

(B) in the heading for subsection (b)(2), by striking “november 30, 2010” and inserting “january 3, 2012”; and

(C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking “April 30, 2011” and inserting “June 9, 2012”.

(2) Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note; 123 Stat. 444), is amended—

(A) by striking “December 1, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “January 4, 2012”; and

(B) in subsection (c), by striking “May 1, 2011” and inserting “June 11, 2012”.

(3) Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “April 30, 2011” and inserting “June 10, 2012”.

(b) Funding.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (E), by striking “and” at the end; and

(2) by inserting after subparagraph (F) the following:

“(G) the amendments made by sections 501(a)(1) and 503 of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Expansion Act; and”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–205).

SEC. 3. Temporary modification of indicators under the extended benefit program.

(a) Indicator.—Section 203(d) of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended, in the flush matter following paragraph (2), by inserting after the first sentence the following sentence: “Effective with respect to compensation for weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Expansion Act (or, if later, the date established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before December 31, 2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether there has been a state ‘on’ or ‘off’ indicator beginning or ending any extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if the word ‘two’ were ‘three’ in subparagraph (1)(A).”.

(b) Alternative trigger.—Section 203(f) of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) by redesignating paragraph (2) as paragraph (3); and

(2) by inserting after paragraph (1) the following new paragraph:

“(2) Effective with respect to compensation for weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Expansion Act (or, if later, the date established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before December 31, 2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether there has been a state ‘on’ or ‘off’ indicator beginning or ending any extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if the word ‘either’ were ‘any’, the word ‘both’ were ‘all’, and the figure ‘2’ were ‘3’ in clause (1)(A)(ii).”.

SEC. 4. Additional first-tier emergency unemployment compensation.

(a) In general.—Section 4002(b)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (A), by striking “80” and inserting “131”; and

(2) in subparagraph (B), by striking “20” and inserting “34”.

(b) Coordination rule.—Section 4002(f) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by adding the following:

“(3) RULE RELATING TO ADDITIONAL WEEKS OF FIRST-TIER EMERGENCY UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION.—If a State determines that implementation of the increased entitlement to first-tier emergency unemployment compensation by reason of the amendments made by section 503(a) of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Expansion Act would unduly delay the prompt payment of emergency unemployment compensation under this title, such State may elect to pay second-tier emergency unemployment compensation prior to the payment of such increased first-tier emergency unemployment compensation until such time as such State determines that such increased first-tier emergency unemployment compensation may be paid without such undue delay. If a State makes the election under the preceding sentence, then, for purposes of determining whether an account may be augmented for third-tier emergency unemployment compensation under subsection (d), such State shall treat the date of exhaustion of such increased first-tier emergency unemployment compensation as the date of exhaustion of second-tier emergency unemployment compensation, if such date is later than the date of exhaustion of the second-tier emergency unemployment compensation.”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–205), except that no additional first-tier emergency unemployment compensation shall be payable by virtue of the amendments made by subsection (a) (beyond the maximum amount that would have been payable absent those amendments) with respect to any week of unemployment commencing before the date of the enactment of this Act.

SEC. 5. Technical correction relating to repeal of continued dumping and subsidy offset.

(a) In general.—Section 822(2)(A) of the Claims Resolution Act of 2010 is amended by striking “or” and inserting “and”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the provisions of the Claims Resolution Act of 2010.

SEC. 6. Additional extended unemployment benefits under the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act.

(a) Extension.—Section 2(c)(2)(D)(iii) of the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act, as added by section 2006 of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5) and as amended by section 9 of the Worker, Homeownership, and Business Assistance Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–92), is amended—

(1) by striking “June 30, 2010” and inserting “June 30, 2011”; and

(2) by striking “December 31, 2010” and inserting “December 31, 2011”.

(b) Clarification on authority To use funds.—Funds appropriated under either the first or second sentence of clause (iv) of section 2(c)(2)(D) of the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act shall be available to cover the cost of additional extended unemployment benefits provided under such section 2(c)(2)(D) by reason of the amendments made by subsection (a) as well as to cover the cost of such benefits provided under such section 2(c)(2)(D), as in effect on the day before the date of the enactment of this Act.