Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/27/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/17/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/18/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/18/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/18/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/18/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/18/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/18/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/23/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/22/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2010