Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/24/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/24/2009