Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2010