Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/13/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/03/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/11/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/11/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/02/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/13/2010