Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/01/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/14/2010