There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Expanded and Improved Medicare for All Act
United States National Health Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for comprehensive health insurance coverage for all United States residents, improved health care delivery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/26/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
01/27/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/26/2009Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
01/26/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/26/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/26/2009Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/26/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/11/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/11/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/07/2009
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/24/2009 10/21/2009 --

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/26/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/27/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/26/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/26/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.676.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/26/2009)

United States National Health Care Act or the Expanded and Improved Medicare for All Act - Establishes the United States National Health Care (USNHC) Program to provide all individuals residing in the United States and U.S. territories with free health care that includes all medically necessary care, such as primary care and prevention, prescription drugs, emergency care, long-term care, mental health services, dental services, and vision care.

Prohibits an institution from participating unless it is a public or nonprofit institution. Allows nonprofit health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that deliver care in their own facilities to participate.

Gives patients the freedom to choose from participating physicians and institutions.

Prohibits a private health insurer from selling health insurance coverage that duplicates the benefits provided under this Act. Allows such insurers to sell benefits that are not medically necessary, such as cosmetic surgery benefits.

Sets forth methods to pay institutional providers of care and health professionals for services. Prohibits financial incentives between HMOs and physicians based on utilization.

Establishes the USNHC Trust Fund to finance the Program with amounts deposited: (1) from existing sources of government revenues for health care; (2) by increasing personal income taxes on the top 5% income earners; (3) by instituting a progressive excise tax on payroll and self-employment income; and (4) by instituting a small tax on stock and bond transactions. Transfers and appropriates to carry out this Act amounts that would have been appropriated for federal public health care programs, including Medicare, Medicaid, and the State Children's Health Insurance Program.

Requires the USNHC Program to give first priority in retraining and job placement and USNHC employment transition benefits to individuals whose jobs are eliminated due to reduced administration.

Requires creation of a confidential electronic patient record system.

Establishes a National Board of Universal Quality and Access to provide advice on quality, access, and affordability.

Provides for: (1) the eventual integration of the Indian Health Service into the Program; and (2) evaluation of the continued independence of Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) health programs.