Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/22/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/20/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/09/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/09/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/09/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/09/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/09/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/09/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/19/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/15/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/24/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/28/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2010