Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/31/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/17/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/18/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/21/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/23/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/28/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/24/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/24/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/29/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/21/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/29/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/08/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 01/29/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/29/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/19/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/23/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2010