Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/27/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/12/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2009