There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supply Our Soldiers Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for free mailing privileges for personal correspondence and parcels sent to members of the Armed Forces serving on active duty in Iraq or Afghanistan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/30/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/27/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/03/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/28/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/27/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/30/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.704.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.704. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2009)

Supply Our Soldiers Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Defense to provide for a program under which postal benefits are provided to a member of the Armed Forces who is on active duty and who is either: (1) serving in Iraq or Afghanistan; or (2) hospitalized at a military medical facility as a result of such service. Provides the postal benefits in the form of coupons or other evidence of credit (vouchers) to use for postal-free mailings.