Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/03/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/28/2010