Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/15/2010