Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/28/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/09/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/09/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/09/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/19/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/24/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/26/2010