Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/20/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2010