Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/15/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/02/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/19/2009