There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to permit candidates for election for Federal office to designate an individual who will be authorized to disburse funds of the authorized campaign committees of the candidate in the event of the death of the candidate.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/22/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4594)
04/21/2009Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-77.
01/28/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/23/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
04/22/2009-11:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/22/2009-11:04amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4594)
04/22/2009-10:58amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 749.
04/22/2009-10:58amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4594-4595)
04/22/2009-10:58amHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/21/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 34.
04/21/2009HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-77.
03/25/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
03/25/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
01/28/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
01/28/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/28/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration01/28/2009 Referred to
03/25/2009 Markup by
04/21/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-77
Senate Rules and Administration04/23/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.749.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/22/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to permit candidates for election to federal office to: (1) designate an individual for each of a candiate's authorized campaign committees who will be authorized to disburse funds of the committee in the event of the candidate's death; and (2) designate another individual to carry out the responsibilities of the designated individual in the event of the death or incapacity of the designated individual or the designated individual's unwillingness to carry out the responsibilities.

Prescribes procedures for filing and revoking such a designation. Permits the filing of a designation to contain the candidate's instructions regarding the disbursement of funds.