Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009