There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Pediatric Research Consortia Establishment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pediatric Research Consortia Establishment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title IV of the Public Health Service Act to provide for the establishment of pediatric research consortia.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7177)
09/28/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-640.
01/28/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/30/2010-12:38amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:38amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7177)
09/30/2010-12:37amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7379)
09/28/2010-9:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Burgess objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-9:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 758.
09/28/2010-9:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7177-7178)
09/28/2010-9:25pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/28/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 380.
09/28/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-640.
09/23/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/23/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/16/2010HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/16/2010HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/15/2010HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/02/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/28/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/28/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/28/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/28/2009 Referred to
09/23/2010 Markup by
09/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-640
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2009 Referred to
09/15/2010 Hearings by
09/16/2010 Markup by
09/16/2010 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/15/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.758. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 28, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pediatric Research Consortia Establishment Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH), acting through the Director of the Eunice Kennedy Shriver National Institute of Child Health and Human Development, to award grants, contracts, or cooperative agreements to public or nonprofit private entities to pay all or part of the cost of planning, establishing, and providing basic operating support for up to 20 national pediatric research consortia. Requires the Director of NIH to take unmet research needs into account when making awards under this Act.

Declares that research conducted under this Act shall supplement, but not replace, research that is otherwise conducted or supported as part of the comprehensive pediatric research portfolio.

Requires consortia to conduct basic, clinical, behavioral, social, or translational research, as well as training in, and demonstration of, advanced diagnostic and treatment methods relating to pediatrics.

Requires the Director of NIH to: (1) provide for the coordination of information and ensure regular communication between consortia; and (2) require periodic reports on the activities of the consortia.

Requires each consortium under this Act to be formed from a collaboration of cooperating institutions with a lead institution, meeting requirements that may be prescribed by the Director of NIH.

Declares that payments made under this Act may be provided for a period of five years and extended for additional five-year periods with enhanced funding opportunities based on an appropriate scientific review of the operations.