Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/28/2010