Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/03/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/10/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 11/15/2010